SD SB131 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2024 S.J. 422
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2024 S.J. 422
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Include shelterbelts as a factor affecting productivity in determining assessed value of agricultural land.
Title
Include shelterbelts as a factor affecting productivity in determining assessed value of agricultural land.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2024 S.J. 422 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 21, 2024 S.J. 373 |
2024-02-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 362 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 347 |
2024-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 334 |
2024-02-13 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-13 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-06 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 261 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 257 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 131A |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-24 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 165 |