SD SB136 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the state aid to education formula and to make an appropriation.
Title
Revise the state aid to education formula and to make an appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Tabled (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 733 |
2013-03-04 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 613 |
2013-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-21 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 479 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 491 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 445 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 425 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 169 |