SD SB152 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor S.J. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor S.J. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation for certain costs related to mountain pine beetle suppression and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation for certain costs related to mountain pine beetle suppression and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 736 |
2015-03-13 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 731 |
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 785 |
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by President S.J. 726 |
2015-03-12 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 1. H.J. 750 |
2015-03-12 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 741 Amendment cc152a |
2015-03-12 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 702 |
2015-03-12 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 692 Amendment Cc152a |
2015-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 727 |
2015-03-11 | House | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 670 |
2015-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 692 |
2015-03-09 | House | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 658 |
2015-03-09 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 152nc |
2015-03-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-03-05 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2015-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-19 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 453 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 437 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 389 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 152ga |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 216 |