SD SB156 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on March 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-29 - Signed by Governor S.J. 684
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require that determinations in both adult and juvenile court proceedings relative to a controlled substance violation of a high school student participating in extracurricular activities be reported to the South Dakota High School Activities Association and to the school administrator.
Title
Require that determinations in both adult and juvenile court proceedings relative to a controlled substance violation of a high school student participating in extracurricular activities be reported to the South Dakota High School Activities Association and to the school administrator.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Deferred to another day (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Deferred to another day (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Signed by Governor S.J. 684 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 817 | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 639 | |
2010-03-09 | Signed by President S.J. 622 | |
2010-03-08 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 748 | |
2010-03-04 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 709 | |
2010-03-03 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 671 | |
2010-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-24 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 602 | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 438 | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 420 | |
2010-02-18 | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 362 | |
2010-02-18 | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 156ca | |
2010-02-18 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-16 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-09 | Education Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. | |
2010-02-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-04 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-02-04 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-28 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 171 |