SD SB179 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor S.J. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor S.J. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to record search fees in the Unified Judicial System.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to record search fees in the Unified Judicial System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 57 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 57 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 736 |
2015-03-13 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 731 |
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 785 |
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by President S.J. 726 |
2015-03-12 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 4. H.J. 750 |
2015-03-12 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 740 Amendment cc179a |
2015-03-12 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 704 |
2015-03-12 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 691 Amendment Cc179a |
2015-03-11 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 727 |
2015-03-11 | House | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 668 |
2015-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 9. H.J. 709 |
2015-03-10 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 709 Amendment 179rb |
2015-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 669 |
2015-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 643 |
2015-03-05 | House | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. H.J. 604 |
2015-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-18 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 431 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 420 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. S.J. 388 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-03 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 261 |