SD SB179 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the property tax levies for the general fund of school districts and to revise the state aid to education formula.
Title
Revise the property tax levies for the general fund of school districts and to revise the state aid to education formula.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - Taxation Recommend Referral as Amended to House Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - Taxation Recommend Referral as Amended to House Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733 |
2019-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 756 |
2019-03-12 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 716 |
2019-03-12 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 698 |
2019-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 2. H.J. 698 |
2019-03-06 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. H.J. 650 |
2019-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 603 |
2019-02-28 | House | Taxation Recommend Referral as Amended to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 583 |
2019-02-28 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 179ca |
2019-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 552 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 509 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 509 Amendment 179nb |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 472 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 413 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 179na |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 231 |