SD SB199 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2024 S.J. 528
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2024 S.J. 528
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise provisions pertaining to the consolidation or boundary changes of counties.
Title
Revise provisions pertaining to the consolidation or boundary changes of counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2024 S.J. 528 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 05, 2024 S.J. 480 |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 468 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 461 |
2024-02-28 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 4. H.J. 430 |
2024-02-27 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-21 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 367 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 361 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 199C |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-01-31 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 220 |