SD SB28 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Board of Regents to contract for the redesign and renovation of, and the design and construction of an addition to, the Sanford Jackrabbit Athletic Complex on the campus of South Dakota State University, together with equipment and furnishings, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Authorize the Board of Regents to contract for the redesign and renovation of, and the design and construction of an addition to, the Sanford Jackrabbit Athletic Complex on the campus of South Dakota State University, together with equipment and furnishings, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 63 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Education: Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 S.J. 476 |
2021-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 550 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 465 |
2021-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 4. H.J. 517 |
2021-03-04 | House | First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 494 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 396 |
2021-03-01 | Joint | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 2. |
2021-03-01 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing J.J. 1 |
2021-02-11 | Joint | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 101 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 87 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 28A |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 14 |
Subjects
Appropriation
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Higher Education
Procurement of Public Improvements
Emergency Clause
Executive/Judiciary Request
Higher Education
Procurement of Public Improvements