SD SB71 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Signed by Governor S.J. 580
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Signed by Governor S.J. 580
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow the contract for the publication of the codified laws to be extended for more than one year.
Title
Allow the contract for the publication of the codified laws to be extended for more than one year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 580 |
2014-03-05 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 544 |
2014-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 638 |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by President S.J. 524 |
2014-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 0. H.J. 593 |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-02-26 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 567 |
2014-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-29 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 160 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 134 |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-01-24 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 107 |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-21 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 87 |