TX HB1272 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of a warrant authorizing the use of a no-knock entry by a peace officer.
Title
Relating to the issuance of a warrant authorizing the use of a no-knock entry by a peace officer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-09 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB175 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Referred to Criminal Justice
HB492 (Same As) 2021-05-31 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
HB2009 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB4464 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB492 (Same As) 2021-05-31 - Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
HB2009 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB4464 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence