TX HB1564 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Considered in Calendars
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Considered in Calendars
Summary
Relating to the eligibility for unemployment benefits of individuals who are unemployed due to certain labor disputes.
Title
Relating to the eligibility for unemployment benefits of individuals who are unemployed due to certain labor disputes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-08 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-01 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-01 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-25 | Left pending in subcommittee | |
2009-03-25 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | |
2009-03-25 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-09 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time | |
2009-02-20 | Filed |