TX HB1662 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain requirements and procedures regarding the posting of a school district's employment policy.
Title
Relating to certain requirements and procedures regarding the posting of a school district's employment policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - House - Amended RV#245 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-18 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-18 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-18 | House | Record vote RV#245 |
2023-04-18 | House | Passed as amended |
2023-04-18 | House | Amended 1-Burns |
2023-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-17 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-28 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2023-03-07 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--School Districts
Electronic Information Systems
GRIEVANCE PROCEDURES
Labor
Labor--Management Relations
Education--School Districts
Electronic Information Systems
GRIEVANCE PROCEDURES
Labor
Labor--Management Relations