TX HB1731 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the inclusion of students receiving treatment in a residential facility in the determination of dropout rates for purposes of public school accountability.
Title
Relating to the inclusion of students receiving treatment in a residential facility in the determination of dropout rates for purposes of public school accountability.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken King [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#254 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-13 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed |
2017-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-21 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
DROPOUTS & AT-RISK STUDENTS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance