TX HB2168 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to the powers of a sheriff's department civil service commission in certain counties regarding an appeal of a disciplinary action.
Title
Relating to the powers of a sheriff's department civil service commission in certain counties regarding an appeal of a disciplinary action.
Sponsors
Rep. Norma Chavez [D] | Rep. Stephen Frost [D] | Rep. Robert Miklos [D] | Rep. Hubert Vo [D] |
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-27 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-26 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-26 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-27 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Passed | |
2009-04-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-24 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-24 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-24 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Public Safety | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time | |
2009-03-03 | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Labor
Labor--Management Relations
Law Enforcement
County Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Labor
Labor--Management Relations
Law Enforcement