TX HB3819 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to limits on the purpose and power of a fresh water supply district.
Title
Relating to limits on the purpose and power of a fresh water supply district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-31 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1254 (Same As) 2009-04-20 - Referred to Natural Resources
Subjects
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility