TX SB1254 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Referred to Natural Resources
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-20 - Referred to Natural Resources
Summary
Relating to limits on the purpose and power of a fresh water supply district.
Title
Relating to limits on the purpose and power of a fresh water supply district.
Sponsors
Sen. Kel Seliger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-04-20 | Read first time | |
2009-04-16 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-15 | Record vote | |
2009-04-15 | Passed | |
2009-04-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-15 | Record vote | |
2009-04-15 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-15 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-15 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-15 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-15 | Amended | |
2009-04-15 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-15 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-07 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-02 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-02 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-24 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-02 | Filed | |
2009-03-02 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3819 (Same As) 2009-03-31 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Property Interests
Property Interests--Eminent Domain
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility