TX SB860 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of career and technology education courses in certain partnership programs to provide high school dropout recovery.
Title
Relating to the provision of career and technology education courses in certain partnership programs to provide high school dropout recovery.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] |
Rep. Marsha Farney [R] | Rep. James Keffer [R] | Rep. Chris Paddie [R] | Rep. Oscar Longoria [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - House - SB 860Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Effective immediately | |
2013-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-13 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-13 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-09 | Senate | House passage reported |
2013-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-08 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2013-05-03 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-05-01 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2013-04-22 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
DROPOUTS & AT-RISK STUDENTS
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Vocational
TECHNICAL EDUCATION
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Vocational
TECHNICAL EDUCATION