US HB3723 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-09-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the National Flood Insurance Program. This bill amends the National Flood Insurance Act of 1968 to extend the National Flood Insurance Program through FY2019.
Title
To extend the National Flood Insurance Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2017-09-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3128 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB6379 (Related) 2018-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6402 (Related) 2018-07-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB3628 (Related) 2018-12-31 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 148, enrollment corrections on S. 3628 have been made.
HB7187 (Related) 2018-12-01 - Became Public Law No: 115-281.
SB3670 (Related) 2018-11-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3703 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB6379 (Related) 2018-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6402 (Related) 2018-07-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB3628 (Related) 2018-12-31 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 148, enrollment corrections on S. 3628 have been made.
HB7187 (Related) 2018-12-01 - Became Public Law No: 115-281.
SB3670 (Related) 2018-11-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3703 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3723/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3723/BILLS-115hr3723ih.pdf |