US SB3670 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Flood Insurance Program Extension Act of 2018 This bill amends the National Flood Insurance Act of 1968 to reauthorize the National Flood Insurance Program through December 7, 2018. The bill shall take effect as if it had been enacted on November 30, 2018.
Title
National Flood Insurance Program Extension Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1423 (Related) 2017-03-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB2874 (Related) 2017-11-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB3285 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
HB3723 (Related) 2017-09-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6379 (Related) 2018-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6402 (Related) 2018-07-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB7187 (Related) 2018-12-01 - Became Public Law No: 115-281.
SB1182 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-225. (TXT | PDF)
SB1313 (Related) 2017-06-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3337-3338)
SB1368 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1571 (Related) 2017-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3128 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3628 (Related) 2018-12-31 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 148, enrollment corrections on S. 3628 have been made.
SB3703 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB7388 (Related) 2018-12-21 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 148 - 226 (Roll no. 497). (text: CR H10560-10566)
HB2874 (Related) 2017-11-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB3285 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
HB3723 (Related) 2017-09-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6379 (Related) 2018-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB6402 (Related) 2018-07-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
HB7187 (Related) 2018-12-01 - Became Public Law No: 115-281.
SB1182 (Related) 2018-07-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-225. (TXT | PDF)
SB1313 (Related) 2017-06-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3337-3338)
SB1368 (Related) 2017-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1571 (Related) 2017-07-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3128 (Related) 2018-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB3628 (Related) 2018-12-31 - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 148, enrollment corrections on S. 3628 have been made.
SB3703 (Related) 2018-12-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB7388 (Related) 2018-12-21 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 148 - 226 (Roll no. 497). (text: CR H10560-10566)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/3670/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s3670/BILLS-115s3670is.pdf |