US HB5237 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Workforce Protections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Workforce Protections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Workplace Advancement Act This bill amends the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to prohibit discharging or retaliating against any employee because such employee has inquired about, discussed, or disclosed comparative compensation information for the purpose of determining whether the employer is compensating an employee in a manner that provides equal pay for equal work. The prohibition does not apply to instances in which an employee who has access to the wage information of other employees as a part of the employee's job functions discloses such wages to an individual who has no access to them, except in response to a charge or complaint or in furtherance of an investigation, proceeding, hearing, or action with respect to prohibited sex discrimination, including an investigation conducted by the employer.
Title
Workplace Advancement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. David Young [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections. |
2016-05-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2016-05-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1619 (Related) 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
SB83 (Related) 2015-01-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB862 (Related) 2015-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB875 (Related) 2015-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2070 (Related) 2015-09-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2200 (Related) 2015-10-26 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278.
SB2773 (Related) 2016-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB83 (Related) 2015-01-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB862 (Related) 2015-03-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB875 (Related) 2015-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2070 (Related) 2015-09-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2200 (Related) 2015-10-26 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278.
SB2773 (Related) 2016-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Labor and employment
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Wages and earnings
Women's employment
Labor and employment
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Wages and earnings
Women's employment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/5237/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr5237/BILLS-114hr5237ih.pdf |