US SB2200 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on October 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-26 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-26 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Workplace Advancement Act This bill amends the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to prohibit discharging or retaliating against any employee because such employee has inquired about, discussed, or disclosed comparative compensation information for the purpose of determining whether the employer is compensating an employee in a manner that provides equal pay for equal work. The prohibition does not apply to instances in which an employee who has access to the wage information of other employees as a part of the employee's job functions discloses such wages to an individual who has no access to them, except in response to a charge or complaint or in furtherance of an investigation, proceeding, hearing, or action with respect to prohibited sex discrimination, including an investigation conducted by the employer. It is the sense of Congress that: (1) gender-based discrimination in wages or compensation violates existing law, and (2) Congress recommits itself to the principles of equal pay for equal work.
Title
Workplace Advancement Act
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-26 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278. |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
Same As/Similar To
SB875 (Related) 2015-03-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB5237 (Related) 2016-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
HB5237 (Related) 2016-09-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Subjects
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Labor and employment
Labor standards
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Wages and earnings
Women's employment
Labor and employment
Labor standards
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Wages and earnings
Women's employment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/senate-bill/2200/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/s2200/BILLS-114s2200pcs.pdf |