US HB7974 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on August 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-07 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-07 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To modify the deadline for completing the 2020 decennial census of population and related tabulations, and for other purposes.
Title
Fair and Accurate Census Act
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7034 (Related) 2020-05-27 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4048 (Related) 2020-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB8250 (Related) 2020-09-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SB4571 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4048 (Related) 2020-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB8250 (Related) 2020-09-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SB4571 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Appropriations
Census and government statistics
Congressional districts and representation
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Department of Commerce
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Higher education
Student records
Census and government statistics
Congressional districts and representation
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Department of Commerce
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Higher education
Student records
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7974/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7974/BILLS-116hr7974ih.pdf |