US HB8250 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends certain deadlines for the U.S. Census Bureau to complete the 2020 decennial census of population. The bill prohibits the bureau from concluding the Nonresponse Followup operation or the Self-Response operation before October 31, 2020.
Title
2020 Census Deadline Extensions Act
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] |
Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] |
Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] |
Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2020-09-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7974 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4048 (Related) 2020-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4571 (Same As) 2020-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4048 (Related) 2020-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4571 (Same As) 2020-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Census and government statistics
Congressional districts and representation
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Congressional districts and representation
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8250/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8250/BILLS-116hr8250ih.pdf |