US SB4048 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the deadline for the U.S. Census Bureau to complete the 2020 decennial census of population and related tabulations and provides $400 million to address the impacts of COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) on the census and to support enhanced census activities. The bill requires the bureau to report specified information, such as (1) the total number of field staff, sorted by category; (2) the anticipated schedule of census operations; (3) total spending on media, advertisements, and partnership specialists; and (4) post-enumeration survey schedule and completion progress, including anticipated schedule for release of results from the coverage measurement survey. An institution of higher education may provide to the bureau information requested for purposes of enumeration for the 2020 decennial census of population, subject to certain public notice requirements. The institution may not provide any information to the bureau on an individual's immigration or citizenship status. The bureau may not compile, produce, or publish any data product or tabulation as part of, in combination with, or in connection with the 2020 decennial census of population or any such census data that includes topics specific to the 2020 census that were not part of a report submitted on March 28, 2017, and the 2018 End-to-End Census Test conducted in Providence County, Rhode Island. The bill provides funding for specified activities, including expanded communications and advertising targeted to low self-response communities in rural and urban areas, Alaska Native villages, and on tribal lands.
Title
Fair and Accurate Census Act
Sponsors
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB7034 (Related) 2020-05-27 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7974 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8250 (Related) 2020-09-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SB4571 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB7974 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8250 (Related) 2020-09-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SB4571 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Appropriations
Census and government statistics
Civil actions and liability
Computers and information technology
Congressional districts and representation
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Higher education
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Law enforcement administration and funding
Photography and imaging
Postal service
Rural conditions and development
State and local government operations
Student records
Temporary and part-time employment
Census and government statistics
Civil actions and liability
Computers and information technology
Congressional districts and representation
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Higher education
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Law enforcement administration and funding
Photography and imaging
Postal service
Rural conditions and development
State and local government operations
Student records
Temporary and part-time employment
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4048/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4048/BILLS-116s4048is.pdf |