VA HB1215 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 13-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 13-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reckless driving; violation of right-of-way. Provides that a person shall be guilty of reckless driving who commits certain traffic infractions for violation of right-of-way when the violation results in the death or serious bodily injury of another person.
Title
Reckless driving; violation of right-of-way.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-07 - House - House: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 13-N) (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | House | Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (9-Y 13-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred from Transportation by voice vote |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 14103786D |