VA HB889 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0771)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0771)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nonpayment of wages; defense of contractor. Provides that a general contractor or subcontractor, regardless of tier, may submit as evidence in defending against a claim for nonpayment a written certification, under oath, from any lower-tier subcontractor stating that (i) the subcontractor and each of his sub-subcontractors has paid all employees all wages due for the period during which the wages are claimed for the work performed on the project and (ii) to the subcontractor's knowledge, all sub-subcontractors below the subcontractor, regardless of tier, have similarly paid their employees all such wages.
Title
Nonpayment of wages; defense of contractor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (62-Y 38-N) (Y: 62 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (70-Y 28-N) (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (63-Y 37-N) (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (70-Y 28-N) (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (63-Y 37-N) (Y: 63 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0771) | |
2022-04-27 | House | Enacted, Chapter 771 (effective 7/1/22) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB889ER2) |
2022-04-27 | House | Reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (62-Y 38-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (62-Y 38-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB889ER) |
2022-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-28 | House | VOTE: Adoption (70-Y 28-N) |
2022-02-28 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22106710D-S1 (70-Y 28-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 2-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB889S1 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106710D-S1 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106710D-S1 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (63-Y 37-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (63-Y 37-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB889H1 |
2022-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 22104921D-H1 |
2022-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 22104921D-H1 |
2022-01-27 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (14-Y 8-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-12 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102768D |
Same As/Similar To
SB538 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)
SB538 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)
SB538 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)