VA SB538 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nonpayment of wages; defense of contractor. Provides that a general contractor or subcontractor, regardless of tier, may submit as evidence in defending against a claim for nonpayment a written certification, under oath, from any lower-tier subcontractor stating that (i) the subcontractor and each of his sub-subcontractors has paid all employees all wages due for the period during which the wages are claimed for the work performed on the project and (ii) to the subcontractor's knowledge, all sub-subcontractors below the subcontractor, regardless of tier, have similarly paid their employees all such wages.
Title
Nonpayment of wages; defense of contractor.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (72-Y 27-N) (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 34-N) (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 34-N) (Y: 65 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (14-Y 8-N) (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Judiciary (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0726) | |
2022-04-27 | House | Enacted, Chapter 726 (effective 7/1/22) |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB538ER2) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (72-Y 27-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (72-Y 27-N) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House reprinted (SB538ER) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB538ER) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-25 | House | VOTE: Passage (65-Y 34-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Passed House (65-Y 34-N) |
2022-02-25 | House | Committee substitute rejected 22106854D-H1 |
2022-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2022-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106854D-H1 |
2022-02-22 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (14-Y 8-N) |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB538S1 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22105298D-S1 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read second time |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22105298D-S1 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Labor and Employment |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Commerce and Labor |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Rereferred from Judiciary (11-Y 4-N) |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102773D |
Same As/Similar To
HB889 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0771)
HB889 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0771)
HB889 (Same As) 2022-04-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0771)