VA SB230 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340)
Summary
Provisions for subdivision of a lot for conveyance to a family member. Includes stepchildren within the definition of "immediate family" for purposes of family subdivision provisions. This bill is identical to
Title
Subdivision of lot; stepchildren included as immediate family for conveyance thereof.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340) | |
2008-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 340 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-26 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB230ER) | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | House: Passed House with amendments (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2008-02-20 | House: Amendments by Delegate Griffith agreed to | |
2008-02-20 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-19 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-19 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-18 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-15 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-15 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2008-01-07 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084624272 |
Same As/Similar To
HB190 (Same As) 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0717)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB230 |