MA H1089 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4136
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4136
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4136
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to further clarifying the rehabilitation of property under the Housing Development Incentive Program. Housing.
Title
Relative to the housing development incentive program
Sponsors
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] | Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D] | Sen. Thomas McGee [D] | Rep. Dennis Rosa [D] |
Rep. Stephen DiNatale [D] | Rep. Antonio Cabral [D] | Rep. Christine Barber [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4136 |
2015-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H4136 (Replaced by) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H144 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2065
H3133 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4616
H2253 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2254 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H644 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Senate concurred
H144 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2065
H3133 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4616
H2253 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2254 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H644 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1089 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1089.pdf |