MA H1612 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5123
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the payment of wages for persons under 18 years of age who work less than 20 per week. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Creating a youth wage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5123 |
2019-06-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1695 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H2293 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H24 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1666 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H3354 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1104 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S1059 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H176 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4488
H1599 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1606 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2706 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H120 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4488
H1618 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4170
H3963 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S2362 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4161 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
H5123 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2293 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H24 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1666 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H3354 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1104 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S1059 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S344 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H176 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4488
H1599 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1606 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H2706 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H120 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4488
H1618 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4170
H3963 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S2362 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4161 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
H5123 (Replaced by) 2020-11-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1612 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1612.pdf |