MA H166 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4440
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a social equity and technical assistance trust fund to encourage and facilitate assistance to social equity applicants seeking to enter the cannabis industry. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Relative to a social equity training and technical assistance fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4440 |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S1909 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S63 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
S77 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
H158 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H4440 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1649 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2466 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
H759 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H1735 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1340 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4696
S63 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
S77 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
H158 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H4440 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1649 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2466 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
H759 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5026
H1735 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H1340 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4696
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H166 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H166.pdf |