MA S77 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2660
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to support partnerships between the cannabis industry and municipalities. Cannabis Policy.
Title
To support partnerships between the cannabis industry and municipalities
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Moran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2660 |
2021-05-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/11/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
Same As/Similar To
S148 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H3100 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
H562 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5101
S2395 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S632 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1323 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1955 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S2025 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S2660 (Replaced by) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2801
H166 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H158 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H4791 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Published as amended, see H4800
H4800 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - H4791, published as amended
H3100 (Similar To) 2022-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4910
H562 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5101
S2395 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S632 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S1323 (Similar To) 2021-12-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1955 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S2025 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
S2660 (Replaced by) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2801
H166 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H158 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H4791 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Published as amended, see H4800
H4800 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - H4791, published as amended
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S77 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S77.pdf |