MA H158 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4440
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote social equity and economic empowerment in the cannabis industry. Cannabis Policy.
Title
To promote social equity and economic empowerment in the cannabis industry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4440 |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
S63 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
H166 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S77 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
H4440 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4800 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - H4791, published as amended
H4791 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Published as amended, see H4800
H166 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S77 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
H4440 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4800 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - H4791, published as amended
H4791 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Published as amended, see H4800
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H158 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H158.pdf |