MA S63 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2660
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote social equity and economic empowerment in the cannabis industry. Cannabis Policy.
Title
To promote social equity and economic empowerment in the cannabis industry
Sponsors
Sen. Nick Collins [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D] | Sen. Adam Hinds [D] |
Sen. Adam Gomez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2660 |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/15/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
Same As/Similar To
H158 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
H95 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Text of an amendment, see H90
S191 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H4059 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2525 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, see S2557
S2535 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3094
H4133 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S74 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H1359 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
S76 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S75 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
H2013 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
S1349 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S532 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1861 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1068 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2660 (Replaced by) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2801
H166 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S77 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
H4791 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Published as amended, see H4800
H4800 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - H4791, published as amended
H90 (Similar To) 2021-04-20 - For actions on the section returned with recommendations of amendments, see H3702
S35 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - See H90
H95 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Text of an amendment, see H90
S191 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H4059 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2525 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, see S2557
S2535 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3094
H4133 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S74 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H1359 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
S76 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S75 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
H2013 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
S1349 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S532 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1861 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1068 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S505 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2660 (Replaced by) 2022-04-07 - New draft substituted, see S2801
H166 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S77 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2660
H4791 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - Published as amended, see H4800
H4800 (Similar To) 2022-05-18 - H4791, published as amended
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S63 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S63.pdf |