MA H3197 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3768
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize medical marijuana treatment centers to sell recreational marijuana. Marijuana Policy.
Title
Authorizing medical marijuana treatment centers to sell recreational marijuana beginning July 1, 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3768 |
2017-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Marijuana Policy |
Same As/Similar To
H1058 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3173 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1050 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
S1059 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1060 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
H3768 (Replaced by) 2017-06-21 - Published as amended, see H3776
S2090 (Similar To) 2017-06-22 - See H3776
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
S2097 (Similar To) 2017-06-23 - See H3776
H3173 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1050 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
S1059 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
S1060 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2488
H3768 (Replaced by) 2017-06-21 - Published as amended, see H3776
S2090 (Similar To) 2017-06-22 - See H3776
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
S2097 (Similar To) 2017-06-23 - See H3776
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3197 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3197.pdf |