MA H3405 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish cultural corridors. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
Establishing Massachusetts Cultural Corridors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-01-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1262 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S178 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #328 (Yeas 36 to Nays 0)
S1699 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1050 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1787 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1647 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H155 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1062 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2059 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H3707 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912
H1866 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied H1856
H3926 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4707
H2144 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4532
H2476 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3504 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
S993 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4115 (Similar To) 2018-11-06 - Approved by the People at the state election, Chapter 322 of the Acts of 2018
H4665 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2614 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2018
H4914 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 319 of the Acts of 2018
H4971 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S178 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #328 (Yeas 36 to Nays 0)
S1699 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
H1050 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1787 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1647 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H155 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1062 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2059 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H3707 (Similar To) 2017-09-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3912
H1866 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied H1856
H3926 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4707
H2144 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4532
H2476 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3504 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
S993 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H4115 (Similar To) 2018-11-06 - Approved by the People at the state election, Chapter 322 of the Acts of 2018
H4665 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2614 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 217 of the Acts of 2018
H4914 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 319 of the Acts of 2018
H4971 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3405 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3405.pdf |