MA H374 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4880
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the listing of the alcohol by volume for beer selections on menus. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
For all licensees for beer to be drunk on the premises must list the alcohol by volume for each beer selection on the menu
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4880 |
2021-08-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/30/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3861 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4115
H3890 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H3739 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3895
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3907 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3933 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H4065 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4086 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4664
H4132 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S526 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H940
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H422 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S200 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S196 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S246 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2566
H4880 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S228 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H3890 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H3739 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3895
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3907 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3933 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H4065 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4086 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4664
H4132 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S526 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied H940
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H422 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S200 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S196 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S246 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2566
H4880 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S228 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H374 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H374.pdf |