MA H395 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5011
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5011
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to add arts education to the STEM advisory council. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to science, technology, engineering, arts and math, or STEAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5011 |
2019-10-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S1859 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Accompanied H525
S218 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2886
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S759 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2736
S760 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2737
S761 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
H3911 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H4041 (Similar To) 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 273 of the Acts of 2020
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4099 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2019
H4177 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H4275 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H5011 (Replaced by) 2020-10-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1859 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Accompanied H525
S218 (Similar To) 2020-08-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2886
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S759 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2736
S760 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2737
S761 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
H3911 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H4041 (Similar To) 2021-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 273 of the Acts of 2020
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4099 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2019
H4177 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H4275 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H5011 (Replaced by) 2020-10-13 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H395 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H395.pdf |