MA H618 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4539
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4539
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to LGBTQ+ inclusive curriculum in public schools. Education.
Title
Relative to LGBTQ+ inclusive curriculum
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4539 |
2021-09-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S310 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
H3485 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H578 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
S360 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S2541 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H622 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
S202 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
S311 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2785
S1570 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4539 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3485 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4966
H578 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
S360 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S2541 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H622 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5135
S202 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
S311 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2785
S1570 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4539 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H618 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H618.pdf |