MA S1149 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2199
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the closing of hospital essential services. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the closing of hospital essential services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2199 |
2015-11-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/08/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2199 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S283 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1103 (Similar To) 2016-06-28 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2370
S1017 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S556 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S680 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S1189 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2213
S1141 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2294
S1261 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1361 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S473 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S438 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1462 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S283 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1103 (Similar To) 2016-06-28 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2370
S1017 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S556 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S680 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2214
S1189 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2213
S1141 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2294
S1261 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1361 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S473 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S438 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1462 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1149 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1149.pdf |