MA S1698 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2549
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize voluntary contributions to the Massachusetts Fire Fighters Academy Trust Fund. Revenue.
Title
Authorizing voluntary contributions to the Massachusetts Fire Fighters Academy Trust Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Rep. Shawn Dooley [R] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] |
Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2549 |
2019-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3200 (Similar To) 2020-10-19 - House concurred
S2106 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H1704 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
S2549 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2106 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
H1704 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H4016 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 50 of the Acts of 2019
S2549 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1698 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1698.pdf |