MA S2188 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2381
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2381
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2381
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the city of Easthampton to grant 8 additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises, 4 additional licenses for the sale of wine and malt beverages to be drunk on the premises and 2 additional licenses for the sale of wine and malt beverages to be drunk off the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Easthampton to grant 8 additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises, 4 additional licenses for the sale of wine and malt beverages to be drunk on the premise and 2 additional licenses for the sale of wine and malt beverages to be drunk off the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2381 |
2019-04-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S526 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H292 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H3795
S1714 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S186 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - New draft substituted, see S2212
H251 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2212 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2019
H3747 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4334
S2229 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - New draft substituted, see S2331
H3821 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4402
H3847 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2019
H3864 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4085
H3967 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4086
H3992 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3991 (Similar To) 2020-11-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 214 of the Acts of 2020
H346 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2381 (Replaced by) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
H4197 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4809
H4270 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4340
H4271 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5068
H292 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H3795
S1714 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S186 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - New draft substituted, see S2212
H251 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2212 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2019
H3747 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4334
S2229 (Similar To) 2019-09-09 - New draft substituted, see S2331
H3821 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4402
H3847 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2019
H3864 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4085
H3967 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4086
H3992 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3991 (Similar To) 2020-11-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 214 of the Acts of 2020
H346 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S2381 (Replaced by) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
H4197 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4809
H4270 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4340
H4271 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5068
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2188 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2188.pdf |