MA S2229 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2331
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-09 - New draft substituted, see S2331
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-09 - New draft substituted, see S2331
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to amending the home rule charter of the city of Easthampton. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the home rule charter of the city of Easthampton
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-09 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2331 |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:30 AM-02:00 PM in 222 |
2019-06-03 | House | House concurred |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3822 (Similar To) 2019-10-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 78 of the Acts of 2019
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S314 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2249 (Similar To) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 305 of the Acts of 2020
H3903 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
S2264 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Amended (DiZoglio) by substituting a new draft, see S2626
S2269 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied S1203
H3938 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5008
S2283 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2020
H3954 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H3961 (Similar To) 2020-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2019
H3969 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2020
H3985 (Similar To) 2019-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2019
S2331 (Replaced by) 2019-09-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2019
S332 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
S2406 (Similar To) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2019
H4222 (Similar To) 2020-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2020
S306 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S307 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S314 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H3853 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2249 (Similar To) 2021-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 305 of the Acts of 2020
H3903 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
S2264 (Similar To) 2020-04-06 - Amended (DiZoglio) by substituting a new draft, see S2626
S2269 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Accompanied S1203
H3938 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H5008
S2283 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2020
H3954 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4011
H3961 (Similar To) 2020-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 153 of the Acts of 2019
H3969 (Similar To) 2020-04-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 61 of the Acts of 2020
H3985 (Similar To) 2019-12-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2019
S2331 (Replaced by) 2019-09-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2019
S332 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S337 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
S2406 (Similar To) 2020-01-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 152 of the Acts of 2019
H4222 (Similar To) 2020-08-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 164 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2229 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2229.pdf |