MA S2344 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Further regulating the sale and consumption of alcoholic beverages at certain polling places in the town of Middleton
Title
Further regulating the sale and consumption of alcoholic beverages at certain polling places in the town of Middleton
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-25 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2019 | |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-10-17 | House | Enacted |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in the House amendment |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-07 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2019-09-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-09-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-09-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-09-23 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Substituted for S2232 |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Recommended new draft (Tarr) for S2232 |
Same As/Similar To
S2232 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - New draft substituted, see S2344
H705 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H633 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H649 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H699 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H705 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H633 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H649 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4403
H699 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2344 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2344.pdf |