MA S2558 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S352
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on June 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-16 - House concurred
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-16 - House concurred
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to home care workforce initiatives; and of Aaron Vega and others relative to home care,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2558).
Title
Relative to home care workforce initiatives
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-16 | House | House concurred |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2018-06-14 | Senate | New draft of S352 and H350 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S352 (Replaces) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2558
H82 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H350 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2558
H344 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2068 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
S351 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H82 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H350 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2558
H344 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
H2068 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H4659
S351 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2558 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2558.pdf |