US HB190 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making Servicemember Foreclosure Protections Permanent Act Amends the Honoring America's Veterans and Caring for Camp Lejeune Families Act of 2012 to make permanent the extended one-year period after a servicemember's military service during which: (1) a court may stay proceedings to enforce an obligation on real or personal property owned by the servicemember prior to such military service; and (2) the sale, foreclosure, or seizure of such property is invalid without a court order or agreement.
Title
Making Servicemember Foreclosure Protections Permanent Act
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2015-01-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB189 (Related) 2015-12-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 273.
SB1152 (Related) 2015-04-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2347 (Related) 2015-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2357 (Related) 2015-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2393 (Related) 2016-03-31 - Became Public Law No: 114-142. (TXT | PDF)
HB4252 (Related) 2015-12-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
SB1152 (Related) 2015-04-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2347 (Related) 2015-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2357 (Related) 2015-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2393 (Related) 2016-03-31 - Became Public Law No: 114-142. (TXT | PDF)
HB4252 (Related) 2015-12-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Housing finance and home ownership
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Housing finance and home ownership
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/190/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr190/BILLS-114hr190ih.pdf |