US SB2393 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Became Public Law No: 114-142. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Became Public Law No: 114-142. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Foreclosure Relief and Extension for Servicemembers Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Honoring America's Veterans and Caring for Camp Lejeune Families Act of 2012 to extend through 2017 the one-year period after a service member's military service during which: (1) a court may stay proceedings to enforce an obligation on real or personal property owned by the service member before such military service; and (2) any sale, foreclosure, or seizure of such property shall be invalid without a court order or waiver agreement signed by the service member. (Currently, the extended one-year period is scheduled to expire on December 31, 2015, and return to a nine-month period under the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act.) Effective January 1, 2018 (currently, January 1, 2016), the old nine-month period in place of the one-year period granted by such Act shall be restored.
Title
Foreclosure Relief and Extension for Servicemembers Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-142. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-03-31 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-03-31 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-03-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-03-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1484) |
2016-03-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2393. |
2016-03-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1484-1485) |
2016-03-21 | House | Mr. Coffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-12-11 | House | Held at the desk. |
2015-12-11 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-12-11 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8618-8619; text as passed Senate: CR S8618-8619) |
Same As/Similar To
HB189 (Related) 2015-12-01 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 273.
HB190 (Related) 2015-02-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB2475 (Related) 2015-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB4252 (Same As) 2015-12-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
SB1152 (Related) 2015-04-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2347 (Related) 2015-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2357 (Same As) 2015-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB190 (Related) 2015-02-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB2475 (Related) 2015-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
HB4252 (Same As) 2015-12-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
SB1152 (Related) 2015-04-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2347 (Related) 2015-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB2357 (Same As) 2015-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Housing finance and home ownership
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Housing finance and home ownership
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs