MA S1087 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2550
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to raise employment and combating opioids through vocational education and rehabilitation (RECOVER). Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Raising employment and combating opioids through vocational education and rehabilitation (RECOVER)
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Kennedy [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. James Arciero [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2550 |
2019-08-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-04-08 | House | House concurred |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1119 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
S2168 (Similar To) 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1516 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1112 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S1277 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1097 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1585 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2019
H3742 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2019
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S2550 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2168 (Similar To) 2021-01-05 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1516 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1112 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S1277 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S1097 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1585 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2019
H3742 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2019
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S2550 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1087 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1087.pdf |